TN HB1477 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-03 - Failed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, permits the use of a photo identification card issued by this state, the United States, or an accredited postsecondary institution of education in this state for purposes of verifying the identity of an eligible voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, permits the use of a photo identification card issued by this state, the United States, or an accredited postsecondary institution of education in this state for purposes of verifying the identity of an eligible voter. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-03HouseFailed in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee of Local Committee
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1318 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback