TN HB1441 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Medical Cannabis Act," which establishes a medical cannabis program to be administered by the medical cannabis commission. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 38, Chapter 3; Title 39, Chapter 17; Title 43; Title 50; Title 53; Title 63; Title 67 and Title 68, relative to the "Tennessee Medical Cannabis Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Iris Rudder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee -- Criminal Justice Committee -- Government Operations for Review |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1104 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-28 - Failed in Senate Judiciary Committee