TN HB1425 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pr. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pr. Ch. 9
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Subject to local approval, requires purchases or contracts of more than $500 to be approved by the governing body; requires expenditures or contracts of more than $10,000 to be made only after sealed bids have been invited. - Amends Chapter 87 of the Private Acts of 1981.
Title
Subject to local approval, requires purchases or contracts of more than $500 to be approved by the governing body; requires expenditures or contracts of more than $10,000 to be made only after sealed bids have been invited. - Amends Chapter 87 of the Private Acts of 1981.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Pr. Ch. 9 | |
2017-05-02 | Signed by Governor. | |
2017-04-25 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-04-24 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-04-18 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2017-04-17 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-03-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2017-03-23 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-03-20 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1436 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 9