TN HB1417 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-05-27 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, increases the penalty for aggravated assault and reckless endangerment when committed from within a motor vehicle; requires the court to revoke a defendant's license for up to one year following any period of confinement imposed; requires that a motor vehicle used in a second or subsequent offense be seized and forfeited. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, increases the penalty for aggravated assault and reckless endangerment when committed from within a motor vehicle; requires the court to revoke a defendant's license for up to one year following any period of confinement imposed; requires that a motor vehicle used in a second or subsequent offense be seized and forfeited. - Amends TCA Title 39, Chapter 13 and Title 40.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Towns [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-27 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee of Judiciary Committee |
2020-05-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 5/27/2020 |
2020-03-17 | House | Meeting Canceled |
2020-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/17/2020 |
2020-03-06 | House | Ressigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/6/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0742 (Crossfiled) 2020-06-09 - Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 12/1/2020