TN HB1412 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on January 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 23-1)
Status: Failed on January 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-02-18 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Natural Marriage Defense Act"; states the policy of Tennessee to defend natural marriage between one man and one woman regardless of any court decision to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Natural Marriage Defense Act"; states the policy of Tennessee to defend natural marriage between one man and one woman regardless of any court decision to the contrary. - Amends TCA Title 36.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Pody [R] | Rep. Courtney Rogers [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Bud Hulsey [R] |
Rep. Rick Womick [R] | Rep. David Hawk [R] | Rep. Andy Holt [R] | Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
Rep. Dale Carr [R] | Rep. John Windle [D] | Rep. Roger Kane [R] | Rep. Matthew Hill [R] |
Rep. Glen Casada [R] | Rep. Billy Spivey [R] | Rep. Timothy Hill [R] | Rep. Tilman Goins [R] |
Rep. Jimmy Eldridge [R] | Rep. James Van Huss [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. Sabi Kumar [R] |
Rep. Debra Moody [R] | Rep. Dan Howell [R] | Rep. Ron Lollar [R] | Rep. Sheila Butt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-20 | House | Failed in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee of Civil Justice Committee |
2016-01-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 1/20/2016 |
2016-01-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2016-01-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee-- Local Government |
2016-01-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2016-01-12 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-12-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-11-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-11-04 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-09-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-09-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-09-17 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1437 (Crossfiled) 2016-01-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1412&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1412.pdf |