TN HB1392 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 11-6)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 03/18/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes governmental entities to regulate entertainment transportation services. - Amends TCA Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 7, Chapter 51, Part 10, relative to the regulation of transportation services.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 77 N: 9 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Effective date(s) 03/18/2022 | |
2022-03-30 | Pub. Ch. 666 | |
2022-03-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-08 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-03-07 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2022-03-03 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2022-03-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 77, Nays 9, PNV 3 |
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-24 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/3/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/24/2022 |
2022-02-10 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 2/8/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-02-01 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 2/2/2022 |
2022-01-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2022-01-25 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-25 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2022-01-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-01-19 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 1/25/2022 |
2021-10-19 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-10-19 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Transportation Committee to First Calendar of 2022 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Transportation Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-30 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Transportation Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-11 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0825 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 666