TN HB1380 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-10 - Taken off notice for cal. in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that the commissioner of education's annual report to the governor on the receipts and disbursements of public school funds, condition of public schools, and recommendations for improvement be submitted by September 1 each year. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Title
As introduced, requires that the commissioner of education's annual report to the governor on the receipts and disbursements of public school funds, condition of public schools, and recommendations for improvement be submitted by September 1 each year. - Amends TCA Title 39 and Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-10 | House | Taken off notice for cal. in Education |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Education for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2019-03-19 | House | Ref. to Education |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1399 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-10 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee