TN HB1368 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires public records commission to annually report any changes to the public records laws in this state to the general assembly not later than December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, requires public records commission to annually report any changes to the public records laws in this state to the general assembly not later than December 31 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 10, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1024 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee