TN HB1362 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-30 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Small Estate Affidavit Limited Letter of Authority Act," which is a rewrite of "The Small Estates Act." - Amends TCA Section 8-21-401; Section 30-4-103; Section 30-4-104 and Section 30-4-101.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Section 8-21-401; Section 30-4-103; Section 30-4-104 and Section 30-4-101, relative to probate.
Sponsors
Rep. Johnny Garrett [R] | Rep. Ron Travis [R] | Rep. Bill Beck [D] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-30 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-03-30 | Pub. Ch. 665 | |
2022-03-18 | Signed by Governor. | |
2022-03-11 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2022-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-03-09 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-03-03 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2022-03-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-03-03 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 92, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1362 |
2022-02-28 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 3/3/22 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0486) |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2022-01-19 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-04-14 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-13 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2021-04-12 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0175) |
2021-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/12/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/8/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee for 3/24/2021 |
2021-03-17 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-03-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Children & Family Affairs Subcommittee |
2021-02-25 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-22 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0888 (Crossfiled) 2022-03-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 665