TN HB1356 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-27 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that delinquent taxes on property for which the owner filed an action or claim against the Tennessee Valley Authority arising out of a coal ash spill will not be subject to the penalty and interest provisions and would only accrue interest from the delinquency date of the respective tax year at the composite prime rate published by the federal reserve board as of the delinquency date, minus two points. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, specifies that delinquent taxes on property for which the owner filed an action or claim against the Tennessee Valley Authority arising out of a coal ash spill will not be subject to the penalty and interest provisions and would only accrue interest from the delinquency date of the respective tax year at the composite prime rate published by the federal reserve board as of the delinquency date, minus two points. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-27HouseReturned to the Clerk's Desk.
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Local Committee
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1365 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback