TN HB1356 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that delinquent taxes on property for which the owner filed an action or claim against the Tennessee Valley Authority arising out of a coal ash spill will not be subject to the penalty and interest provisions and would only accrue interest from the delinquency date of the respective tax year at the composite prime rate published by the federal reserve board as of the delinquency date, minus two points. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Title
As introduced, specifies that delinquent taxes on property for which the owner filed an action or claim against the Tennessee Valley Authority arising out of a coal ash spill will not be subject to the penalty and interest provisions and would only accrue interest from the delinquency date of the respective tax year at the composite prime rate published by the federal reserve board as of the delinquency date, minus two points. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 5.
Sponsors
Rep. Kent Calfee [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Returned to the Clerk's Desk. |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee to 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Property & Planning Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1365 (Crossfiled) 2019-11-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee