TN HB1355 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Pr. Ch. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-17 - Pr. Ch. 22
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, reallocates proceeds from the hotel/motel tax from the general fund for county general revenue to be designated for the maintenance and renovation of certain county owned buildings, rather than for courthouse maintenance and renovation. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1996.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, reallocates proceeds from the hotel/motel tax from the general fund for county general revenue to be designated for the maintenance and renovation of certain county owned buildings, rather than for courthouse maintenance and renovation. - Amends Chapter 133 of the Private Acts of 1996.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-11 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-10 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2013-04-09 - House - (VOICE VOTE) LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-17 | Senate | Pr. Ch. 22 |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-05-01 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2013-04-15 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2013-04-15 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2013-04-11 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2013-04-11 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0 |
2013-04-10 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 4/11/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-09 | House | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/9/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2013-03-25 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-03-22 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1407 (Crossfiled) 2013-05-17 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 22