TN HB1341 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-25 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes obsolete requirement that the commissioner conduct a study of impediments to insurance for the use of justifiable force and report the results of that study to the general assembly and governor no later than March 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 27 and Title 56.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8, Chapter 27 and Title 56, relative to insurance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-02-25 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-02-24 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1012 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-26 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee