TN HB1330 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Enrolled on May 6 2019 - 75% progression
Action: 2019-05-15 - Transmitted to Governor for his action.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, deletes an obsolete provision requiring the office of research and education accountability to report on whether community schools have met their education and community goals to the education committees of the general assembly by November 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, deletes an obsolete provision requiring the office of research and education accountability to report on whether community schools have met their education and community goals to the education committees of the general assembly by November 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 24.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-01 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-30 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-15 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-15HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2019-05-13SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-05-08HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-05-06HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2019-05-01HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 91, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB1330
2019-04-30HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar
2019-04-30SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2019-04-30SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0382)
2019-04-30SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2019-04-17SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2019-04-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2019-04-15HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-15HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0249)
2019-04-11HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/15/2019
2019-04-10HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/11/2019
2019-04-03HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Education for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseNo Action Taken
2019-03-20HousePlaced on cal. Education for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-27HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c K-12 Subcommittee of Education
2019-02-20HousePlaced on s/c cal K-12 Subcommittee for 2/27/2019
2019-02-19HouseAssigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
2019-02-19HouseRef. to Education
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1058 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Companion House Bill substituted

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback