TN HB1330 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-15 - Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, changes March 1 to March 15 of each year the date by which the department of health must submit a report with de-identified aggregate claims data on every discharge that includes coded drug poisonings for the calendar year two years prior to the current year by licensed hospitals. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Title
As introduced, changes March 1 to March 15 of each year the date by which the department of health must submit a report with de-identified aggregate claims data on every discharge that includes coded drug poisonings for the calendar year two years prior to the current year by licensed hospitals. - Amends TCA Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1131 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-28 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Health & Welfare Committee