TN HB1321 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Employee Vehicle Privacy Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 47 and Title 50.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Employee Vehicle Privacy Act." - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 47 and Title 50.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Employee Affairs Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Consumer and Human Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0979 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee