TN HB1311 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 48
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, for purposes of receiving a sales tax exemption, increases, from 15 days to 30 days, the period of time within which a helicopter, airplane, or related equipment purchased by a nonresident must be removed outside of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-313.
Title
As enacted, for purposes of receiving a sales tax exemption, increases, from 15 days to 30 days, the period of time within which a helicopter, airplane, or related equipment purchased by a nonresident must be removed outside of Tennessee. - Amends TCA Section 67-6-313.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] | Rep. Bob Ramsey [R] | Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 48 | |
2015-03-16 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-12 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/16/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/12/2015 |
2015-03-10 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/10/2015 |
2015-03-04 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/4/2015 |
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0847 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-01 - Pub. Ch. 48