TN HB1306 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Passed on June 14 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-14 - Pub. Ch. 488
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, creates a special joint committee to study issues relating to the investigation and prosecution of unsolved civil rights crimes and cold cases from the civil rights era. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, creates a special joint committee to study issues relating to the investigation and prosecution of unsolved civil rights crimes and cold cases from the civil rights era. - Amends TCA Title 3, Chapter 1, Part 1.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-10 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 79 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-09 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-06-14 Pub. Ch. 488
2017-06-14 Effective date(s) 06/06/2017
2017-06-06 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-30HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-23SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-18HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-05-12HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-05-10SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 29, Nays 0
2017-05-10SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0477)
2017-05-10SenateMotion to reconsider adopted. (Amendment 1 - SA0477)
2017-05-10SenateMotion to reconsider adopted.
2017-05-10SenateTabling Motion Lifted
2017-05-10SenatePlaced on Senate Message Calendar 2 calendar for 5/10/2017
2017-05-10HouseH. nonconcurred in S. am. no. 1
2017-05-10HouseMotion to reconsider adopted.
2017-05-10HouseMotion to lift from table adopted.
2017-05-09HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 79, Nays 5 PNV 1 HB1306
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 28, Nays 0
2017-05-09SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0477)
2017-05-09SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-05-09SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-05-09HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-05-09HousePassed H., Ayes 90, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-05-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-05-09HouseH. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/9/2017
2017-05-09HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-05-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-08HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-05-01HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-05-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Study Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means for 5/1/2017
2017-04-19HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to Study Subcommittee
2017-04-12HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017
2017-04-12HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/19/2017
2017-04-06HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-04-04HouseRec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 4/4/2017
2017-03-28HouseAction def. in State Government Committee to 4/4/2017
2017-03-24HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-22HousePlaced on cal. State Government Committee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-22HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to State Government Committee
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/22/2017
2017-03-15HouseMeeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c State Government Subcommittee to 3/22/17
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal State Government Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c State Government Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to State Government Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1279 (Crossfiled) 2017-06-14 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 488

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback