TN HB1286 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-06-01 - Effective date(s) 05/25/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, adds Wilson County Promotions, Inc., a not-for-profit corporation, to the entities with which the Tennessee state fair and exposition commission may work to conduct a fair or exposition; provides for the Tennessee state fair being held at the Wilson County fairgrounds. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 57; Title 5, Chapter 9 and Title 43, Chapter 21.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, Chapter 57; Title 5, Chapter 9 and Title 43, Chapter 21, relative to the Tennessee State Fair.
Sponsors
Rep. Pat Marsh [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-01 | Effective date(s) 05/25/2021 | |
2021-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 543 | |
2021-05-25 | Signed by Governor. | |
2021-05-14 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2021-05-13 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-06 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-04-22 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2021-04-22 | House | Passed H., Ayes 89, Nays 2, PNV 0 |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2021-03-16 | House | Sponsor change. |
2021-03-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture & Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture & Natural Resources Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1155 (Crossfiled) 2021-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 543