TN HB1283 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-22 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 345
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires a blood test for the presence of the hepatitis and AIDS/HIV viruses to be administered to an arrested person if requested by a law enforcement officer, TBI employee, firefighter, EMT-paramedic, or EMT who may have been exposed to the virus; specifies that the test is for any hepatitis virus, rather than just hepatitis B. - Amends TCA Section 68-10-116.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires a blood test for the presence of the hepatitis and AIDS/HIV viruses to be administered to an arrested person if requested by a law enforcement officer, TBI employee, firefighter, EMT-paramedic, or EMT who may have been exposed to the virus; specifies that the test is for any hepatitis virus, rather than just hepatitis B. - Amends TCA Section 68-10-116.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-22 Comp. became Pub. Ch. 345
2017-04-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-27HouseComp. SB subst.
2017-04-20HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2017
2017-04-19HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017
2017-04-13HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-12HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-04-11HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-04-05HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/12/2017
2017-04-05HouseAction def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/12/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/5/2017
2017-03-28HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-03-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/28/2017
2017-03-21HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/28/2017
2017-03-15HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/21/2017
2017-03-14HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/21/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/14/2017
2017-02-28HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-17HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee
2017-02-15HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1223 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-22 - Pub. Ch. 345

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback