TN HB1283 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - Failed for Lack of Second in: Elections of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 15 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-15 - Failed for Lack of Second in: Elections of S&LG
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Candidate Selection Integrity Act"; requires persons registering to vote to declare political party affiliation to vote in a primary election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2; Title 2, Chapter 6 and Title 2, Chapter 7.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Candidate Selection Integrity Act"; requires persons registering to vote to declare political party affiliation to vote in a primary election. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 2; Title 2, Chapter 6 and Title 2, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-15 | Failed for Lack of Second in: Elections of S&LG | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on s/c cal Elections of S&LG for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-02-24 | Assigned to s/c Elections of S&LG | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-12 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1400 (Crossfiled) 2009-02-18 - P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1283&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1283.pdf |