TN HB1272 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-30 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires winery with self-distribution permit to surrender permit within 60 days once the winery no longer qualifies to self distribute. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47; Title 57 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, requires winery with self-distribution permit to surrender permit within 60 days once the winery no longer qualifies to self distribute. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 47; Title 57 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Holt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-30 | House | Withdrawn. |
2020-01-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 2/4/2020 |
2019-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee to First Calendar of 2020 |
2019-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 4/3/2019 |
2019-03-26 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-03-26 | House | Ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0698 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-02 - Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 2020