TN HB1256 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-04-17 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the executive director of the wildlife resources agency to issue an annual report concerning acquisition priorities for wetland and bottomland hardwood forest acquisition. - Amends TCA Section 11-14-401.
Title
As introduced, requires the executive director of the wildlife resources agency to issue an annual report concerning acquisition priorities for wetland and bottomland hardwood forest acquisition. - Amends TCA Section 11-14-401.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-17 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-04-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/17/2019 |
2019-04-10 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2019 |
2019-04-03 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2019-03-27 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2019-03-20 | House | Placed on cal. Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee for 3/27/2019 |
2019-03-19 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee for 3/19/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Agriculture and Natural Resources Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1358 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-30 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee