TN HB1254 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 423
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, revises provisions governing awards of attorney's fees in certain forfeiture actions. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 33.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 33, relative to forfeiture.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-29 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-26 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-05-19 Pub. Ch. 423
2021-05-19 Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
2021-05-12 Signed by Governor.
2021-05-05HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2021-05-04SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2021-05-03HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2021-05-03HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2021-04-29SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 1
2021-04-29SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0393)
2021-04-29SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2021-04-27SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2021-04-26HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2021-04-26HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 2
2021-04-26HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0313)
2021-04-22HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/26/2021
2021-04-21HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021
2021-04-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2021-04-07HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/14/2021
2021-04-06HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-03-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 4/6/2021
2021-03-30HouseAction Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 4/6/2021
2021-03-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/30/2021
2021-02-24HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2021-02-24HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2021-02-22HouseIntro., P1C.
2021-02-11HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1361 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 423

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback