TN HB1251 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, entitles each state employee to a salary increase of $100 per month in odd-numbered years contingent upon the general assembly including in its annual appropriations budget funding for the salary increases. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 54.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, entitles each state employee to a salary increase of $100 per month in odd-numbered years contingent upon the general assembly including in its annual appropriations budget funding for the salary increases. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 40; Title 49 and Title 54.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-11HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0622 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-08 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State & Local Government Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback