TN HB1248 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Failed in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Failed in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, clarifies that the office of early learning within the department of education must provide an annual report to the governor and the general assembly on the status of pre-kindergarten programs by March 1 of each year beginning in 2018; requires the department of education to post the report on the office of early learning website by March 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, clarifies that the office of early learning within the department of education must provide an annual report to the governor and the general assembly on the status of pre-kindergarten programs by March 1 of each year beginning in 2018; requires the department of education to post the report on the office of early learning website by March 1 of each year. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Bill Dunn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-22 | House | Failed in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee of Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/21/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction & Programs Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Instruction & Programs |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1067 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-13 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee