TN HB1237 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the information the department of education must make publicly available concerning the course access program must be available by July 1 following the immediately preceding school year. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to the course access program.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c K-12 Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-11 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1190 (Crossfiled) 2021-04-07 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee