TN HB1237 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-13 - Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires a judge to excuse a practicing physician from jury duty upon the physician's request; requires a physician requesting to be excused from jury duty to provide documentation verifying the individual is a licensed physician. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Title
As introduced, requires a judge to excuse a practicing physician from jury duty upon the physician's request; requires a physician requesting to be excused from jury duty to provide documentation verifying the individual is a licensed physician. - Amends TCA Title 22.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1274 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-19 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee