TN HB1221 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Passed on May 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-30 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 447
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes district attorneys general and similar persons to carry firearms subject to training and certification requirements if certain requirements met. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1350.
Title
As enacted, authorizes district attorneys general and similar persons to carry firearms subject to training and certification requirements if certain requirements met. - Amends TCA Section 39-17-1350.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-30 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 447 | |
2017-05-09 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-09 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-05-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/9/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-05-08 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-05-08 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-05-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017 |
2017-04-26 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/19/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-04-04 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-30 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Meeting Cancelled. Action Def. in s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee to 3/22/17 |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/15/2017 |
2017-02-15 | House | Assigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee |
2017-02-15 | House | P2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee |
2017-02-13 | House | P1C. |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro. |
2017-02-09 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1340 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-30 - Pub. Ch. 447