TN HB1221 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Pub. Ch. 286
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a school in which a child who is a suspected victim of child sexual abuse that occurred while the child was under the supervision or care of the school to make reasonable accommodations to separate the alleged victim of child sexual abuse from the alleged perpetrator. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Title
As enacted, requires a school in which a child who is a suspected victim of child sexual abuse that occurred while the child was under the supervision or care of the school to make reasonable accommodations to separate the alleged victim of child sexual abuse from the alleged perpetrator. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 49.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Pub. Ch. 286 | |
2015-05-06 | Effective date(s) 04/28/2015 | |
2015-04-28 | Signed by Governor. | |
2015-04-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-04-20 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-04-20 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0290) |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-04-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2015-04-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2015-04-14 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-04-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0347) |
2015-04-09 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-08 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/9/2015 |
2015-04-07 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-04-01 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 4/7/2015 |
2015-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-03-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-25 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0656 (Crossfiled) 2015-05-06 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 286