TN HB1214 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-21 - Pub. Ch. 495
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires municipality to notify affected property owners by mail of proposed extension of corporate limits under certain circumstances and requires publication in newspaper. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, requires municipality to notify affected property owners by mail of proposed extension of corporate limits under certain circumstances and requires publication in newspaper. - Amends TCA Title 6, Chapter 51 and Title 6, Chapter 58, Part 1.
Sponsors
Rep. Steve Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-05-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-18 - Senate - (VOICE VOTE) FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT AMEND# 1 BY Yager (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 89 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-13 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-04-05 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-30 - House - (VOICE VOTE) S&LG SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: State & Local Government Commit (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-21 | Pub. Ch. 495 | |
2011-06-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/11 | |
2011-06-16 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-06-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-05-25 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-05-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-05-20 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 93, Nays 0 | |
2011-05-18 | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 5/19/2011 | |
2011-05-18 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 27, Nays 2 | |
2011-05-18 | S. adopted am. 1 | |
2011-05-18 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-04-21 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-04-18 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-04-18 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 89, Nays 1, PNV 2 | |
2011-04-18 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0161) | |
2011-04-13 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/18/2011 | |
2011-04-12 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2011 | |
2011-04-05 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-30 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 4/5/2011 | |
2011-03-30 | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on s/c cal S&LG Subcommittee for 3/30/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Assigned to s/c General Sub of S&LG | |
2011-02-23 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-17 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-16 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0055 (Crossfiled) 2011-06-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 495