TN HB1199 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises present law relative to tuition reimbursement for national guardsmen. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to financial aid.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Williams [R] | Rep. Kelly Keisling [R] | Rep. John Ragan [R] | Rep. Monty Fritts [R] |
Rep. Scott Cepicky [R] | Rep. Chris Hurt [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 485 | |
2023-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2023-04-18 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2023-04-18 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-18 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-04-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/18/2023 |
2023-04-05 | House | Placed behind the budget |
2023-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2023 |
2023-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2023-03-22 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/22/2023 |
2023-03-13 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/13/2023 |
2023-03-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2023-03-07 | House | Ref. to Education Administration |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1303 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/17/2023