TN HB1193 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes the registry of election finance to retain counsel to pursue the collection of unpaid civil penalties assessed by the registry, in lieu of petitioning the attorney general and reporter; states that venue for such suits is the residence of the defendant. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 10, relative to the registry of election finance.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302 | |
2021-04-21 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-21 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-15 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2021 |
2021-04-13 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Local Government Committee for 4/13/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Action Def. in s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee to 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Elections & Campaign Finance Subcommittee |
2021-02-24 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2021-02-22 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0626 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 05/04/2021