TN HB1175 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, expands enhanced penalty for disposal of trash near a scenic highway to include area within 1,000 feet of the highway instead of within 500 feet of the highway. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 17.
Title
As introduced, expands enhanced penalty for disposal of trash near a scenic highway to include area within 1,000 feet of the highway instead of within 500 feet of the highway. - Amends TCA Title 54, Chapter 17.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee |
2015-02-23 | House | P2C, ref. to Transportation Committee |
2015-02-18 | House | P1C. |
2015-02-12 | House | Intro. |
2015-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1259 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-18 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1175&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/HB1175.pdf |