TN HB1173 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes a winery or farm wine producer to self-distribute not more than 10,000 gallons of wine to a satellite facility for sale without obtaining the wine from a wholesaler if the satellite facility is located in the county where the wine was produced or a county contiguous thereto. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Title
As introduced, authorizes a winery or farm wine producer to self-distribute not more than 10,000 gallons of wine to a satellite facility for sale without obtaining the wine from a wholesaler if the satellite facility is located in the county where the wine was produced or a county contiguous thereto. - Amends TCA Title 57.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | House | Withdrawn. |
2019-03-20 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee of State Committee |
2019-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Departments & Agencies Subcommittee for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-13 | House | Assigned to s/c Departments & Agencies Subcommittee |
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to State Committee |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1483 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-21 - Re-refer to Senate Cal. Comm.