TN HB1159 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, allows the department of education to post its annual report on its website in lieu of distributing the report to certain persons and entities. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
As introduced, allows the department of education to post its annual report on its website in lieu of distributing the report to certain persons and entities. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2019-02-07 | House | P1C. |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro. |
2019-02-06 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0728 (Crossfiled) 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee