TN HB1152 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, changes, from 30 to 45, the number of days prior to a local education agency's adoption of a district-wide school safety plan or building-level school safety plan that a summary of the plan must be made available for public comment. - Amends TCA Title 8; Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 49 and Title 62.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8; Title 10, Chapter 7; Title 37; Title 38; Title 39; Title 49 and Title 62, relative to school safety.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB1054 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-10 - Withdrawn.

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback