TN HB1151 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-05-06 - Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that instruments affecting or disposing of real property must state the acreage of the real estate in order to be accepted for recording or filing. - Amends TCA Title 66.
Title
As introduced, requires that instruments affecting or disposing of real property must state the acreage of the real estate in order to be accepted for recording or filing. - Amends TCA Title 66.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-06 | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD of Judiciary Committee | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-28 | Action Def. in s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD to 5/5/2009 | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on s/c cal Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD for 04/28/2009 | |
2009-03-10 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-19 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-18 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1333 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Jud. Comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1151&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1151.pdf |