TN HB1134 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-16 - Pub. Ch. 760
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes NBA and NHL players from being subject to the occupational privilege tax; removal of NBA players from being subject to tax to take effect June 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Title
As enacted, removes NBA and NHL players from being subject to the occupational privilege tax; removal of NBA players from being subject to tax to take effect June 1, 2016. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 17.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-04-07 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 30 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 25 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 59 N: 31 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 5 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 69 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 4 BY Stewart PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 66 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-04-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: LAY ON THE TABLE MOTION TO ADOPT AMENDMENT # 2 BY Fitzhugh PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 65 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-03-27 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Regular Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-25 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2014-03-19 - House - (VOICE VOTE) FINANCE, WAYS & MEANS SUBCOMMITTEE: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-16 | Senate | Pub. Ch. 760 |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Effective date(s) 04/24/2014; 06/01/2016 |
2014-04-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2014-04-15 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2014-04-14 | Senate | Signed by S. Speaker |
2014-04-10 | Senate | Signed by H. Speaker |
2014-04-08 | Senate | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 2 |
2014-04-07 | Senate | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. |
2014-04-07 | House | Rcvd. from H., P1C. |
2014-04-07 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2014-04-07 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 66, Nays 25, PNV 3 |
2014-04-07 | House | Am. no. 5 tabled, Ayes 69, Nays 26 |
2014-04-07 | House | Am. no. 4 tabled, Ayes 66, Nays 28 |
2014-04-07 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA1107) |
2014-04-07 | House | Am. no. 2 tabled, Ayes 65, Nays 31 |
2014-04-07 | House | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0975) |
2014-04-02 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/7/2014 |
2014-04-02 | House | Reset on Regular cal. for 4/07/14 |
2014-03-27 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/2/2014 |
2014-03-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/27/2014 |
2014-03-25 | House | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee |
2014-03-19 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/25/2014 |
2014-03-19 | House | Rec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2014-03-12 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-26 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/19/2014 |
2014-02-19 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/26/2014 |
2013-04-09 | House | Taken Off Notice For Cal. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-04-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/10/2013 |
2013-04-03 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/10/2013 |
2013-03-28 | House | Sponsor change. |
2013-03-27 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-27 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 4/3/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-20 | House | Action Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 3/27/2013 |
2013-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/20/2013 |
2013-02-21 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2013-02-21 | House | P2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2013-02-14 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-13 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1247 (Crossfiled) 2014-05-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 760