TN HB1131 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-10 - Action def. in Judiciary to First Calendar of 2020
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a person charged with a bailable offense will not violate the conditions of their release if the offense is expungeable and the person has not been previously convicted of an offense that is ineligible for expunction. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 7.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, creates a rebuttable presumption that a person charged with a bailable offense will not violate the conditions of their release if the offense is expungeable and the person has not been previously convicted of an offense that is ineligible for expunction. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 11 and Title 40, Chapter 7.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-10HouseAction def. in Judiciary to First Calendar of 2020
2019-04-03HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/10/2019
2019-04-03HouseAction def. in Judiciary to 4/10/2019
2019-03-27HousePlaced on cal. Judiciary for 4/3/2019
2019-03-27HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Judiciary
2019-03-20HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/27/2019
2019-03-20HouseAction Def. in s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee to 3/27/2019
2019-03-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/20/2019
2019-02-13HouseAssigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
2019-02-11HouseP2C, ref. to Judiciary
2019-02-07HouseP1C.
2019-02-06HouseIntro.
2019-02-06HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0409 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-16 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback