TN HB1120 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 597
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-07-16 - Pub. Ch. 597
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the restrictions imposed on where sexual offenders may reside, work, or visit. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Title
As enacted, revises the restrictions imposed on where sexual offenders may reside, work, or visit. - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 39, Part 2.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Haynes [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Woodson (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-06-18 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT Rule 39(3) AMEND# 3 BY Woodson (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-07-16 | Pub. Ch. 597 | |
2009-07-16 | Effective date(s) 08/17/09 | |
2009-07-08 | Signed by Governor. | |
2009-06-30 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2009-06-30 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2009-06-29 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2009-06-24 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2009-06-18 | H. concurred in S. am. no. 3 Ayes 91, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-18 | H. Placed on Message Calendar #3 for 6/18/09 | |
2009-06-18 | Passed S. as am., Ayes 29, Nays 0 | |
2009-06-18 | S. adopted am. 3 | |
2009-06-18 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2009-06-17 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2009-06-17 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2009-06-17 | Passed H., as am., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2009-06-17 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 3 of 0 - HA0848) | |
2009-06-17 | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 2 - HA0827) | |
2009-06-17 | H. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - HA0517) | |
2009-06-16 | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Reset on regular cal. for 6/17/09 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 6/16/2009 | |
2009-06-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 06/16/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-06-15 | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-15 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-06-11 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/15/2009 | |
2009-06-02 | Placed Behind the Budget | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-27 | Action Def. in s/c Budget of FW&M to 6/3/2009 | |
2009-05-20 | Placed on s/c cal Budget of FW&M for 05/27/2009 | |
2009-05-14 | Assigned to s/c Budget of FW&M | |
2009-05-13 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Finance, Ways & Means Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/13/2009 | |
2009-05-06 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/13/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 05/06/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 5/6/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/15/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/15/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-03-25 | Action Def. in Judiciary Committee to 4/8/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Placed on cal. Judiciary Committee for 03/25/2009 | |
2009-03-18 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-03-11 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/18/2009 | |
2009-03-11 | Action Def. in s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD to 3/18/2009 | |
2009-03-04 | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD for 03/11/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Criminal Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0511 (Crossfiled) 2009-07-16 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 597