TN HB1116 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-07 - Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires payment of a $2,500 fee for the transfer of real property located within communities governed by certain nonprofit property owners' associations; adds other related requirements. - Amends TCA Title 8 and Title 66.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 8 and Title 66, relative to the transfer of real property.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-07 | House | Assigned to s/c Property & Planning Subcommittee |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, ref. to Local Government Committee |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1184 (Crossfiled) 2023-02-06 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee