TN HB1111 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 302
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, requires that undefined words be given their natural and ordinary meaning, without forced or subtle construction that would limit or extend the meaning of the language, except when a contrary intention is clearly manifest. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, requires that undefined words be given their natural and ordinary meaning, without forced or subtle construction that would limit or extend the meaning of the language, except when a contrary intention is clearly manifest. - Amends TCA Title 1, Chapter 3.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 23 N: 6 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 70 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PREVIOUS QUESTION PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 61 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19 Pub. Ch. 302
2017-05-19 Effective date(s) 05/05/2017
2017-05-05 Signed by Governor.
2017-05-02HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2017-05-02SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-05-01HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-27HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2017-04-27SenatePassed Senate, Ayes 23, Nays 6, PNV 1
2017-04-27SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2017-03-20SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2017-03-16HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2017-03-16HousePassed H., Ayes 70, Nays 23, PNV 0
2017-03-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-09HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/16/2017
2017-03-08HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/9/2017
2017-03-07HouseRec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee
2017-03-01HousePlaced on cal. Civil Justice Committee for 3/7/2017
2017-03-01HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-22HousePlaced on s/c cal Civil Justice Subcommittee for 3/1/2017
2017-02-15HouseAssigned to s/c Civil Justice Subcommittee
2017-02-15HouseP2C, ref. to Civil Justice Committee
2017-02-13HouseP1C.
2017-02-09HouseIntro.
2017-02-09HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB1085 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 302

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback