TN HB1110 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-17 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, imposes a methodology and disclosure duties on health insurance entities and pharmacy benefits managers concerning calculation of out-of-pocket costs for prescription drugs and covered services. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Title
As enacted, imposes a methodology and disclosure duties on health insurance entities and pharmacy benefits managers concerning calculation of out-of-pocket costs for prescription drugs and covered services. - Amends TCA Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-17 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 355 | |
2009-05-18 | Comp. SB subst. | |
2009-05-14 | Placed on Regular Calendar for 5/18/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 05/14/2009 | |
2009-05-12 | Rec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2009-05-06 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 05/12/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Action Def. in Commerce Committee to 5/12/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 05/05/2009 | |
2009-04-29 | Rec. For Pass. by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee | |
2009-04-22 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/29/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/29/2009 | |
2009-04-15 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/22/2009 | |
2009-04-08 | Action Def. in s/c Industrial Impact of COM to 4/22/2009 | |
2009-04-01 | Placed on s/c cal Industrial Impact of COM for 04/08/2009 | |
2009-02-18 | Assigned to s/c Industrial Impact of COM | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Commerce | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0774 (Crossfiled) 2009-06-17 - Pub. Ch. 355
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1110&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1110.pdf |