TN HB1086 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 355
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a law enforcement agency that discovers potentially exculpatory evidence to report that evidence; enacts the "Post-Conviction Fingerprint Analysis Act of 2021." - Amends TCA Title 40, Chapter 30.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 40, Chapter 30, relative to evidence.
Sponsors
Rep. Michael Curcio [R] | Rep. G.A. Hardaway [D] | Rep. Bob Freeman [D] | Rep. Robin Smith [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 355 | |
2021-04-28 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-04-28 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-22 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/28/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | House | Action def. in Criminal Justice Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 4/7/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/31/2021 |
2021-02-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0448 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021