TN HB1086 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-19 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Support of Entrepreneurship Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
As introduced, enacts the "Tennessee Support of Entrepreneurship Act of 2013." - Amends TCA Title 4.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-19 | House | Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee |
2013-02-14 | House | P2C, ref. to Business and Utilities Committee |
2013-02-13 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2013-02-12 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1207 (Crossfiled) 2013-02-14 - P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1086&ga=108 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/108/Bill/HB1086.pdf |