TN HB1086 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2009 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-17 - Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, revises appointment process of judicial selection commission, clarifies that person on panel rejected by the governor cannot be on second panel of nominees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4.
Title
As introduced, revises appointment process of judicial selection commission, clarifies that person on panel rejected by the governor cannot be on second panel of nominees. - Amends TCA Title 4, Chapter 29 and Title 17, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Rep. Susan Lynn [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-17 | Assigned to s/c Civil Practice and Procedure of JUD | |
2009-02-18 | P2C, ref. to Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-12 | Intro., P1C. | |
2009-02-11 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0379 (Crossfiled) 2009-05-06 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of Jud. Comm
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB1086&ga=106 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/106/Bill/HB1086.pdf |