TN HB1077 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Failed in Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-09 - Failed in Education Instruction
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes antiquated language that required the Howard H. Baker Jr. Center for Public Policy at the University of Tennessee to study the economic feasibility of creating a statewide energy policy and report its findings by December 15, 2014. - Amends TCA Title 49.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, relative to education.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-09 | House | Failed in Education Instruction |
2022-03-02 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/9/2022 |
2022-03-02 | House | Action def. in Education Instruction to 3/9/2022 |
2022-02-23 | House | Placed on cal. Education Instruction for 3/2/2022 |
2022-02-22 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Instruction |
2022-02-22 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2022-02-16 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-15 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-02-08 | House | Action Def. in s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee to 2/22/2022 |
2022-02-02 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 2/8/2022 |
2021-03-30 | House | Def. to Summer Study in Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Instruction Subcommittee for 3/30/2021 |
2021-03-24 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Instruction Subcommittee |
2021-03-24 | House | Ref. to Education Instruction |
2021-02-22 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2021-02-11 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-10 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1225 (Crossfiled) 2022-02-15 - Sponsor(s) Added.