TN HB1066 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - Sponsor(s) withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires that a broadband ready community’s ordinance or policy for reviewing applications must contain a provision that all applications related to the project be either approved or denied within 30 calendar days, rather than 30 business days, after the applications are submitted. - Amends TCA Title 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4, relative to broadband.
Sponsors
Rep. Clark Boyd [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-02 | House | Sponsor(s) withdrawn. |
2023-02-02 | House | Sponsor change. |
2023-02-02 | House | P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt. |
2023-02-01 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-31 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB1283 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee