TN HB1047 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 31 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-02 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires a person who is required to disclose a relationship with an educational institution offering a student athlete a scholarship to also provide, within 48 hours instead of 72 hours of providing the initial disclosure, another written disclosure of such relationship to the student athlete's parent or legal guardian, the secretary of state, and to the athletic director, president, and the general counsel of the educational institution from which such person has influenced or attempted to influence the student athlete to accept the scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 67.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 8; Title 9; Title 49 and Title 67, relative to student athletics.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-02-02HouseP2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.
2023-02-01HouseIntro., P1C.
2023-01-31HouseFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

SB0794 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback